Global patent index - EP 0838014 B1

EP 0838014 B1 2001-01-10 - CONTINUOUS TEXTILE WEB DRIER

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS TEXTILE WEB DRIER

Title (de)

TROCKNER FÜR DURCHLAUFENDE TEXTILBAHNEN

Title (fr)

SECHOIR POUR BANDE DE TISSU CONTINUE

Publication

EP 0838014 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96922027 A

Priority

  • DE 19525545 A
  • EP 9602754 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19525545C1] Tenter driers are frequently used for drying textile webs whose edges have an increased weight per unit area or have been treated with glue. It is extremely difficult to dry the edges to the same degree of residual humidity as the remainder of the web. In the inlet region, the blower box has been replaced by blower pipes extending parallel to the chain rails. The pipes are connected to the recirculated air system of the drier and provided with nozzle apertures directed towards the web edges. Since only a low drying capacity is available, the drier either has to be extended or the throughput speed has to be decreased. With the drier according to the invention, a longitudinal section which starts at the inlet and extends over at least 20 % of the total length is equipped with blower pipes (27, 28) aligned parallel to the chain rails (13, 14). Blower boxes (18, 19) are also mounted in this longitudinal section, both above and below the textile web (15). In order to feed drying medium to the blower pipes (27, 28), an additional blower (32) which is connected to a blower box (18) in the inlet region (1) is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/00; F26B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/02 (2006.01); F26B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/12 (2013.01); F26B 13/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19525545 C1 19960926; AT 198664 T 20010115; EP 0838014 A1 19980429; EP 0838014 B1 20010110; TR 9701371 T1 19980221; US 5946819 A 19990907; WO 9703331 A1 19970130

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2006-07-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BTM-TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606318

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198664

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990301

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980213

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT