Global Patent Index - EP 0838069 A4

EP 0838069 A4 2000-07-12 - SECURE POSTAGE PAYMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

SECURE POSTAGE PAYMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SICHEREN BEZAHLEN VON POSTGEBÜHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REGLER DES AFFRANCHISSEMENTS POSTAUX EN TOUTE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0838069 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97921354 A

Priority

  • US 9706831 W
  • US 1608296 P
  • US 1791196 P
  • US 1552896 P
  • US 1676096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9740472A1] In a postage payment system (100), a secure integrated circuit (IC) card (180) is used to manage postage funds, and create encrypted postage indicia (305, 605, 705). Among other things, the system (100) is capable of performing charge-back accounting of postage expenses and generating mail contents (300). In accordance with an aspect of the invention, the postage indicia (305, 605, 705) are applied to selected locations on the mail contents (300) while they are being generated. In the preferred embodiment, each mail content (300) is placed in a window envelope (340) such that the postage indicium (305, 605, 705) on the mail content (300) exposes through a window (347) of the envelope (340) to facilitate inspection of the indicium (305, 605, 705). In accordance with another aspect of the invention, by including transactional data (708) in addition to the traditional postal data (709) in a postage indicium (305, 605, 705), the indicium (305, 605, 705) can be used to pay bills, purchase products and services, including any courier service different than the postal service, or used as cash, a traveler's check, or money order.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04; G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/04 (2006.01); G06Q 20/34 (2012.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/02 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/346 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07F 7/0866 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00588 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9740472A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9740472 A1 19971030; EP 0838069 A1 19980429; EP 0838069 A4 20000712; JP 3461002 B2 20031027; JP H11503852 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120804

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GARDNER, GARY +DI

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHWARTZ, ROBERT

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BROOKNER, GEORGE

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ESKANDARI, FETNEH

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BROWN, MICHAEL

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MECHLER, DAVID

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEROY, DOUGLAS

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2000-07-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/04 A, 7G 07B 17/02 B

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971220

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE