Global Patent Index - EP 0838215 A3

EP 0838215 A3 2000-05-10 - Use of unsaturated aliphatic esters in perfumery

Title (en)

Use of unsaturated aliphatic esters in perfumery

Title (de)

Verwendung von ungesättigten aliphatischen Estern in der Parfümerie

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'esters aliphatiques insaturés en parfumerie

Publication

EP 0838215 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 97116147 A

Priority

CH 258996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838215A2] A perfume composition or perfumed article (I) comprises a compound of formula (II) with a double bond in one of the two positions indicated:

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/46; C11B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61Q 13/00 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 9/0019 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838215 A2 19980429; EP 0838215 A3 20000510; EP 0838215 B1 20040428; DE 69728837 D1 20040603; DE 69728837 T2 20050203; ES 2219717 T3 20041201; JP 3759670 B2 20060329; JP H10130688 A 19980519; US 5814598 A 19980929

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080917

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219717 T3

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69728837 P 20040603

2004-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 7/46 A, 7C 11B 9/00 B

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL