Global patent index - EP 0838271 A3

EP 0838271 A3 2000-07-19 - Ultrasound transducer

Title (en)

Ultrasound transducer

Title (de)

Ultraschallwandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur ultrasonore

Publication

EP 0838271 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97117979 A

Priority

DE 19644762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838271A2] The ultrasonic transducer includes a recess (14,16) in the edge region of the piezoelectric body and which is in the form of a groove. The groove is arranged on a flat side of the piezoelectric body. Alternatively, the recess can be arranged at the corners of the piezoelectric body. The body has an electrically conducting film (6b) at least in a central region of its flat sides. The film on at least one flat side covers the edge region of the adjacent end surface (10,12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01); G10K 11/26 (2006.01); G10K 11/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0648 (2013.01); G10K 11/26 (2013.01); G10K 11/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838271 A2 19980429; EP 0838271 A3 20000719; EP 0838271 B1 20040107

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59711179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTELLIGENDT SYSTEMS & SERVICES G.M.B.H. & CO. K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INTELLIGENDT SYSTEMS & SERVICES G.M.B.H. & CO. K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-01-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-04-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59711179

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE

2004-01-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTELLIGENDT SYSTEMS & SERVICES GMBH & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR SE