Global Patent Index - EP 0838283 A3

EP 0838283 A3 2001-01-03 - Spring cushion

Title (en)

Spring cushion

Title (de)

Federkissen

Title (fr)

Coussin à ressorts

Publication

EP 0838283 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97116010 A

Priority

DE 19644175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838283A2] A novel spring cushion is made of compacted, knitted fabric. The basic material (24) is knitted with a second, differing material (28) modifying its properties. This is a localised modification or extends overall. Preferably, the basic material comprises individual rows, the modifying material being knitted with it. The rows may alternate between basic and modifying material. The latter may have various desirable physical properties. It for example, damps vibrations, or has good electrical conductivity. The basic material may be of, or includes, steel wire. A modifying material is e.g. polyamide fibre, polytetrafluoroethylene fibre or carbon fibre.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/16; B21F 27/18; F16F 1/362

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/02 (2006.01); B21F 27/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/02 (2013.01); B21F 27/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838283 A2 19980429; EP 0838283 A3 20010103; DE 19644175 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21F 27/16 A, 7B 21F 27/18 B, 7F 16F 1/362 B

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE