Global Patent Index - EP 0838287 B1

EP 0838287 B1 2000-05-03 - Burr remover device and cutting tool for continuous casting installations

Title (en)

Burr remover device and cutting tool for continuous casting installations

Title (de)

Entbartereinrichtung und -werkzeuge für Stahlstranggiessanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et outil coupant d'ébavurage pour les installations de coulée continue

Publication

EP 0838287 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117216 A

Priority

EP 96117216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838287A1] The continuous steel casting installation with a deburring unit for removal of flame-cutting burrs (1) from strips (2) is improved by (a) a vertically movable, tubular body (3) houses a piston (4) which is operated by compressed air containing a lubricant, and serves for pressing a deburring tool (5) against the strip; (b) the tool is designed as an easily changeable deburring cap or deburring chisel (7), and is provided with back and front cutting elements (8); (c) the sides (10) of the tool protect the piston (4) against chips; (d) the shape of the tool in the region of the cutting elements is rounded and slightly inclined in the working direction, or it is a combination of round, inclined and straight sections; and (e) the tool is cooled and lubricated by exhaust compressed air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/12; B22D 11/126

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/126 (2006.01); B22D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1265 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4528 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5182 (2013.01); Y10T 409/501968 (2013.01); Y10T 409/502132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838287 A1 19980429; EP 0838287 B1 20000503; AT 192369 T 20000515; DE 59605139 D1 20000608; ES 2116248 T1 19980716; ES 2116248 T3 20000901; JP H10156498 A 19980616; US 6070311 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HORST K. LOTZ FEUERSCHUTZBAUSTOFFE

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-10-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011027

2001-10-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001013

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20001004

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000929

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000928

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2116248 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605139 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192369 T 20000515

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990126

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980914

1998-08-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-07-29 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-07-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2116248 T1

1998-06-26 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI