Global patent index - EP 0838350 B1

EP 0838350 B1 2000-02-09 - File with a handle

Title (en)

File with a handle

Title (de)

Ordner mit Griff

Title (fr)

Reliure à poignée

Publication

EP 0838350 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420196 A

Priority

FR 9613154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838350A1] The loose leaf binder (14), comprises first (1) and second (2) cover boards forming its main faces. The perpendicular edge (12) or secondary spine, includes a retractable handle (31), comprising a flexible strip, with its central part mounted externally to the edge. The two ends of this flexible handle enter slots in the edge. Restraints at their ends, prevent them from being pulled back out of the slots. Preferably the binder is made of polypropylene, its thickness being 0.2-0.4 mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/0006 (2013.01); B42P 2241/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838350 A1 19980429; EP 0838350 B1 20000209; DE 69701274 D1 20000316; DE 69701274 T2 20000928; FR 2755060 A1 19980430; FR 2755060 B1 19981204

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ASSAYAH RENE SYDNEY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011021

2001-10-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011013

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001219

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-07 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000907

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000904

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701274

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI

2000-02-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000209

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990701

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980903

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI