Global Patent Index - EP 0838392 B1

EP 0838392 B1 2001-04-25 - Regulator for underwater breathing apparatus

Title (en)

Regulator for underwater breathing apparatus

Title (de)

Regler für Tauchatmungsgerät

Title (fr)

Régulateur pour appareil respiratoire de plongée

Publication

EP 0838392 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97117368 A

Priority

IT GE960033 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838392A1] Regulator for underwater breathing apparatus, comprising a box-like body (1) containing the device that regulates the admission of air from the first reducing stage, fitted with a mouthpiece (4) through which the said air is inhaled and an outlet (3) through which the exhaled air is discharged, the said air-regulating device comprising a chamber (501) in which the regulating valve is located and a chamber (401) that communicates with the surrounding water, the said chambers (501, 401) being separated by a diaphragm (10) that controls the regulating valve, with the said chamber (401) that communicates with the surrounding water being delimited by the said diaphragm (10) and by a wall (101) provided with a plurality of apertures (111, 121); the said apertures (111, 121) are provided with means (201) that break up the flow of fluid through the latter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/18 (2006.01); B63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/2227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838392 A1 19980429; EP 0838392 B1 20010425; DE 69704648 D1 20010531; DE 69704648 T2 20011018; IT 241613 Y1 20010509; IT GE960033 U1 19980423; JP 3474411 B2 20031208; JP H10129588 A 19980519; US 6021778 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131008

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121015

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2008-05-30 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051008

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2004-12-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704648 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HTM SPORT S.P.A.

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991213

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980327

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI