Global Patent Index - EP 0838557 B1

EP 0838557 B1 2003-06-04 - Construction system for the erection of buildings

Title (en)

Construction system for the erection of buildings

Title (de)

Bausystem zur Erstellung von Gebäuden

Title (fr)

Système de construction pour l'édification de bâtiments

Publication

EP 0838557 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117772 A

Priority

DE 29618705 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838557A2] The modular building system uses shaped building blocks (14) fitted between the upright timbers (11) of the timber frame (11,12) on the outside walls of the house, so that the timbers are at least partially covered by the building blocks from the outside. Part of the timber frame of the house may be formed from pre-fabricated timber panels, with all parts of the timber frame pref. joined together without the use of metal fixings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/56; E04B 1/26; E04B 2/08; E04B 2/16; E04B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2006.01); E04B 2/16 (2006.01); E04B 2/56 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2013.01); E04B 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2/562 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29618705 U1 19970102; AT 242375 T 20030615; EP 0838557 A2 19980429; EP 0838557 A3 19980527; EP 0838557 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071014

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071014

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ILA BAUEN & WOHNEN OKOLOGISCHE PRODUKTE UND BAUSY

- Effective date: 20071031

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710210 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ILA BAUEN & WOHNEN OEKOLOGISCHE PRODUKTE UND BA

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROSCHUP, HERBERT

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ILA BAUEN & WOHNEN OEKOLOGISCHE PRODUKTE UND BAUSY

1999-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981024

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI