Global Patent Index - EP 0838558 B1

EP 0838558 B1 2000-04-19 - Internal system wall

Title (en)

Internal system wall

Title (de)

Innenwandvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de cloison interne

Publication

EP 0838558 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118431 A

Priority

DK 117796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838558A1] In an internal system wall consisting of a number of panel sections (2) releasably secured between profiled rails (27) rigidly secured to a load-bearing structure, preferably a skeleton of uprights or a permanent wall, the main novel feature is that the profiled rails (27) extend horizontally and mutually parallel and spaced along a substantial part of the circumference of the room or enclosure concerned, whereby said profiled rails (27) comprise a) a fixed rail part (10) secured to the load-bearing structure and adapted to support a panel section (2), and b) a profiled covering rail (20,27) adapted to be secured releasably in the fixed rail part (10) and to retain a panel section against overturning into said room or enclosure. According to the invention, a system wall is provided having mainly horizontally extending dividing lines, and in which erection, dismounting and replacement of covering panels (2) can be carried out at any desired horizontal level, making it pos-sible to build a functional wall surface being aesthetically adapted to other structural wall members and having a calm and harmonic appearance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7457 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7462 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838558 A1 19980429; EP 0838558 B1 20000419; DE 69701718 D1 20000525; DE 69701718 T2 20001130; DK 0838558 T3 20000828

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2003-10-03 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011023

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEKO LOFT + VAEG A/S

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001229

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000928

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000927

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701718 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980508

1998-05-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV