Global Patent Index - EP 0838561 B1

EP 0838561 B1 2003-06-25 - Ventilating element for roofs, with sealing member

Title (en)

Ventilating element for roofs, with sealing member

Title (de)

Lüftungselement für Dächer mit Abdichtorgan

Title (fr)

Elément d'aération pour toitures, avec organe d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 0838561 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118190 A

Priority

DE 19643591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838561A2] The ventilation cap is allocated at least one elastic sealing unit (7) made from a multi-layered element (10). The element is a multi-layered flap, especially a sealing band. The element has comb-shaped indentations. The material of the element is flat, and the layers (31,33,35) are located to overlap each other. At least one layer (31,33,35) is provided with indentations, where the indentations run lateral to the longitudinal direction of the element. The strips located between the indentations have differing widths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/36 (2006.01); E04D 13/17 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2013.01); E04D 1/36 (2013.01); E04D 13/176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643591 A1 19980423; DE 19643591 B4 20070830; AT 243799 T 20030715; DK 0838561 T3 20031020; EP 0838561 A2 19980429; EP 0838561 A3 19990127; EP 0838561 B1 20030625; EP 0838561 B9 20040102

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071021

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LIMACO UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG A.G.

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-10-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2006-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-05 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20041209

2005-05-04 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHEFFLER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-06-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2004-05-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHEFFLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SULZER MANAGEMENT AG

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710340 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV SI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIMACO UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RICKERT, HUBERT

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BWK-DACHZUBEHOER GMBH

1999-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1999-10-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990322;LV PAYMENT 19990322;SI PAYMENT 19990322

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990322

1999-01-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI