Global Patent Index - EP 0838567 B1

EP 0838567 B1 2001-12-19 - Electrically controlled safe lock

Title (en)

Electrically controlled safe lock

Title (de)

Elektrisch gesteuertes Wertfachschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure électrique de coffre-fort

Publication

EP 0838567 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118156 A

Priority

DE 19643754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838567A1] The electrically controlled lock has a magnetic lever (7) which can rest in contact with an electrically activatable holding magnet and which can be moved by external forces. The door (3) carries a closure hook (4) which protrudes into the lock (1) mounted in the frame, in which it is held by a rotatable door blocking device (5). The lock has a slider (2) which rests in contact with the container door and which controls a transverse slider (6) which moves both the door blocking device and the magnetic lever.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 35/12 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/18 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0603 (2013.01); E05B 47/0002 (2013.01); E05B 35/12 (2013.01); E05B 47/0006 (2013.01); E05B 63/0004 (2013.01); E05B 63/0052 (2013.01); E05B 63/18 (2013.01); E05B 65/0075 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0074 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0085 (2013.01); E05C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838567 A1 19980429; EP 0838567 B1 20011219; DE 19643754 A1 19980430; ES 2166942 T3 20020501

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031020

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031020

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021015

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021007

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166942 T3

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705870 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAUER-KROMER GMBH

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980804

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI