Global Patent Index - EP 0838583 B1

EP 0838583 B1 2000-03-22 - Apparatus for monitoring the operations of an engine, in particular the engine of a vehicle

Title (en)

Apparatus for monitoring the operations of an engine, in particular the engine of a vehicle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überwachung des Betriebs eines Dieselmotors, insbesondere eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle du fonctionnement d'un moteur diesel notamment de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0838583 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402543 A

Priority

FR 9613138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838583A1] The apparatus comprises a controller to monitor vibration of the engine during certain phases of it cycle. A vibration detector (2) delivers a signal to a signal processing circuit (5). A time controller (6) establishes time windows for passage of the vibration signal corresponding to the operating cycle of the engine. A set of characteristics are established for the engine by dividing the amplitude of the vibrations by a reference value delivered by a computer (10). The value is the smallest moving average of vibrations measured from each cylinder. When a measured signal moves too far from the reference a look up table is consulted to determine how many revolutions of the engine are permitted, and the engine cut if this number is exceeded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838583 A1 19980429; EP 0838583 B1 20000322; DE 69701500 D1 20000427; DE 69701500 T2 20001221; ES 2143289 T3 20000501; FR 2755185 A1 19980430; FR 2755185 B1 19990115; PT 838583 E 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091027

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2010-05-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-14 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070119

2006-09-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143289 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701500 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980309

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI