Global Patent Index - EP 0838587 B1

EP 0838587 B1 2001-04-04 - Lightened piston

Title (en)

Lightened piston

Title (de)

Leichtbaukolben

Title (fr)

Piston allégé

Publication

EP 0838587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97118337 A

Priority

DE 19643778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838587A1] The piston especially of light metal, has two shaft wall sections (16), which are formed as bearing components. The parts, which do not support the piston (10) on the inner cylinder wall, have been cut away. The wall sections have side edges (20,22) of random curvature, and decrease in size upwards in circumferential direction. The connection walls (18) between the shaft wall sections follow the section edges, so that they slope towards each other in upward direction. The wall sections act as bearers to support the piston on the cylinder wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00; F02F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2013.01); F02F 3/02 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838587 A1 19980429; EP 0838587 B1 20010404; EP 0838587 B2 20050824; DE 19643778 A1 19980507; DE 19643778 C2 20000413; US 6152017 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141022

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121023

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111006

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-09-20 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2005-09-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-08-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-04-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703281 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FEDERAL-MOGUL NUERNBERG GMBH

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980612

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI