Global Patent Index - EP 0838595 B1

EP 0838595 B1 2003-06-18 - Blade support for a compressor

Title (en)

Blade support for a compressor

Title (de)

Schaufelträger für einen Verdichter

Title (fr)

Support pour aube pour un compresseur

Publication

EP 0838595 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810716 A

Priority

DE 19643716 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838595A2] The carrier has cooling channels for a circulating cooling medium. The channels extend at least approximately circumferentially within the blade carrier, within an integral closed water circuit. This consists mainly of circulation pump(31), a pressure accumulator(32) and a heat exchanger(35). The channels are positioned in rings, and each cooling ring(27) has a feed(28) and an outlet(29).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/58; F04D 29/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 3/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/542 (2013.01); F04D 29/582 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838595 A2 19980429; EP 0838595 A3 19981125; EP 0838595 B1 20030618; CN 1091849 C 20021002; CN 1186181 A 19980701; DE 19643716 A1 19980430; JP H10131896 A 19980519; US 5967743 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710300 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI