Global Patent Index - EP 0838644 A3

EP 0838644 A3 2000-06-07 - Method and device for defrosting a cooler of a refrigeration plant

Title (en)

Method and device for defrosting a cooler of a refrigeration plant

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtauen eines Kühlers einer Kälteanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour dégivrer un refroidisseur d'une installation de réfrigération

Publication

EP 0838644 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118534 A

Priority

DE 19644488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838644A2] The method involves blocking the cooler (1) wrt. the coolant circuit and heating only the coolant within the cooler by enabling it to circulate through the cooler via a bypass line (5). A pump (7) and a heater (6) are arranged in the bypass line around the cooler. The heater can be in the form of a heat exchanger or throughflow heater and can have an associated temp. limiter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 47/02 (2006.01); F25D 21/06 (2006.01); F25D 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 47/02 (2013.01); F25D 21/06 (2013.01); F25D 21/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838644 A2 19980429; EP 0838644 A3 20000607; EP 0838644 B1 20040616; DE 19644488 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEYER FRIEDHELM

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061024

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MEYER, FRIEDHELM

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041024

2004-10-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711716 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI LU NL SE

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE GB LI LU NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB LI LU NL SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI