Global patent index - EP 0838656 A3

EP 0838656 A3 2000-01-19 - Guided missile with ram jet engine

Title (en)

Guided missile with ram jet engine

Title (de)

Lenkflugkörper mit Staustrahlantrieb

Title (fr)

Missile guidé à statoréacteur

Publication

EP 0838656 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97114018 A

Priority

DE 19635847 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838656A2] The propulsion mechanism extends over most or all the cross-section of the missile interior, and has two air inlets in the bottom part connected by tail-pipes (8,9) to the rear end. At the latter are four radial and pivoting guidance rudders (11-14). The shafts of the two bottom rudders extend inside the tail-pipes. Rigid rudders are mounted on the missile, extending from the middle to the front part. Each rudder has a linear adjusting-drive unit. In each tail-pipe are two of the adjusting-drive units, offset in the lengthwise and peripheral directions, and working in the lengthwise direction. Each rudder has a linkage coupling point (A1) clear of its pivot axis (R1,R2). For each of the two bottom rudder the coupling between drive unit and coupling point is by a rod with hinge- or ball-joints at both ends. In the case of the top rudders, the coupling is achieved by a double-armed lever (26) hinging on an axis (S) and a rod with a ball-joint at both ends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635847 A1 19980312; DE 19635847 C2 19980716; EP 0838656 A2 19980429; EP 0838656 A3 20000119; EP 0838656 B1 20020213; US 5904319 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59706370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Owner name: MBDA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Free Format Text: FORMER OWNER: LFK LENKFLUGKOERPERSYSTEME GMBH, 81669 MUENCHEN, DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2012-08-23 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59706370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120622

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59706370

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020321

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-02-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: LFK LENKFLUGKOERPERSYSTEME GMBH

1998-10-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AEROSPACE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980421

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE