Global Patent Index - EP 0838693 B1

EP 0838693 B1 2001-04-25 - Antenna-shared distributor and transmission and receiving apparatus using same

Title (en)

Antenna-shared distributor and transmission and receiving apparatus using same

Title (de)

Antennensignalverteiler und Sende- und Empfangvorrichtung unter Verwendung desselben

Title (fr)

Distributeur de signal d'antenne et dispositif d'émission-réception en faisant usage

Publication

EP 0838693 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118293 A

Priority

JP 28068196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838693A1] An antenna-shared distributor (2) is provided such that a non- conductor section is provided in a part of two conductor planes (14, 15), a dielectric resonator (11) which resonates in the HE111 mode is disposed in that part, and first and second dielectric strips whose respective end portions face the dielectric resonator (11) are disposed, forming first and second dielectric lines (12, 13) and further, a voltage-control oscillator (1) and a mixer (3) are connected to the first and second dielectric lines (12, 13), respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 7/03; H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/213 (2006.01); G01S 7/03 (2006.01); H01P 3/16 (2006.01); H01P 5/02 (2006.01); H01Q 1/27 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01); H01Q 19/06 (2006.01); H03D 9/06 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01); H04B 1/44 (2006.01); G01S 7/02 (2006.01); G01S 13/34 (2006.01); G01S 13/93 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 3/165 (2013.01); G01S 7/032 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3233 (2013.01); H01Q 13/24 (2013.01); H01Q 19/062 (2013.01); G01S 7/034 (2013.01); G01S 13/34 (2013.01); G01S 13/931 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838693 A1 19980429; EP 0838693 B1 20010425; CN 1116616 C 20030730; CN 1189705 A 19980805; DE 69704649 D1 20010531; DE 69704649 T2 20020418; JP 3119176 B2 20001218; JP H10126109 A 19980515; US 6008755 A 19991228

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091021

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704649 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971021

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI