Global Patent Index - EP 0838746 B1

EP 0838746 B1 2001-12-12 - Voltage regulator

Title (en)

Voltage regulator

Title (de)

Spannungsregler

Title (fr)

Régulateur de tension

Publication

EP 0838746 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97410121 A

Priority

FR 9613281 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838746A1] The voltage regulator has an input terminal (EL) which is connected to a supply voltage (VL). A reference generator circuit (1') delivers a reference voltage (VBG) which is proportional to the required regulated output voltage (VR). An amplifier circuit (2') amplifies the error signal between the reference voltage and the actual output voltage to produce a constant of proportionality. A capacitor (C) is connected across the output of the regulator to sustain the output voltage temporarily and the energy stored in the capacitor is used to temporarily supply the regulator circuit if the supply voltage falls. A comparator (12) delivers an external logic signal if the supply voltage falls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/59; G05F 1/575

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/59 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0838746 A1 19980429; EP 0838746 B1 20011212; DE 69709030 D1 20020124; FR 2755317 A1 19980430; FR 2755317 B1 19990115; US 6084389 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061024

2005-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-03-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709030 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-02-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VOLTAGE REGULATOR

2001-02-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VOLTAGE REGULATOR

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

1999-02-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

1999-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-01-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981012

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT