Global Patent Index - EP 0838781 A3

EP 0838781 A3 2000-11-08 - Case for magnetic and/or chip card

Title (en)

Case for magnetic and/or chip card

Title (de)

Etui für Karten mit Magnetstreifen und/oder Chips

Title (fr)

Etui pou carte magnétique ou à puce

Publication

EP 0838781 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97118428 A

Priority

DE 29618546 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0838781A2] The case (1) is manufactured from pulled, or forced, magnetic sheet and two framed sheets (8,9), that is connected together, via spacer outer strips (10,11,12). The two magnetic sheets create a magnetic field with a particular field strength, and a screen guarantees against magnetic field irregularities. The depth of the field strength may be dependent on the thickness of both sheets. The field strength may be measurable, with a Hall generator, at an angle of 90 degrees perpendicular to the both sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/02; G06K 19/077

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29618546 U1 19970123; EP 0838781 A2 19980429; EP 0838781 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI