Global Patent Index - EP 0839011 B1

EP 0839011 B1 2002-11-13 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE FOOT SUPPORT, IN PARTICULAR FOR ASSEMBLY TABLES

Title (en)

HEIGHT-ADJUSTABLE FOOT SUPPORT, IN PARTICULAR FOR ASSEMBLY TABLES

Title (de)

HÖHENVERSTELLBARE FUSSAUFLAGE, INSBESONDERE FÜR MONTAGETISCHE

Title (fr)

REPOSE-PIED REGLABLE EN HAUTEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR TABLES DE MONTAGE

Publication

EP 0839011 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97907026 A

Priority

  • DE 9700157 W
  • DE 19615532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19615532C1] A height-adjustable foot support (20), in particular for an assembly table (10), is guided on at least one vertical guiding bar (15) with a first guiding surface (16) and a second guiding surface (17). The first guiding surface (16) has a toothed rack (18) upon which rolls a toothed wheel (31) rotatively mounted on the foot support (20). A prestressed traction spring (35) engages the foot support (20). The foot support (20) has a swivelling thrust bearing (29) on its guiding surface (17) opposite to the toothed rack (18). In an inclined position of the foot support (20), a clamping jaw (27) assisted by the force of the traction spring (35) engages the guiding surface (16) opposite to the guiding surface (17) for the thrust bearing (29), so that the foot support (20) may be locked in the inclined position on the guiding bar (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 16/02 (2006.01); B25H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 16/025 (2013.01); B25H 1/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19615532 C1 19970619; CZ 294436 B6 20050112; CZ 9704044 A3 19990217; EP 0839011 A1 19980506; EP 0839011 B1 20021113; HU 220741 B1 20020528; HU 9901555 A2 19990830; HU 9901555 A3 20000728; WO 9739658 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708707

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2006-01-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708707 20021219

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020121

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980504

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI SE