Global Patent Index - EP 0839223 B1

EP 0839223 B1 2001-04-04 - RAISING MACHINE

Title (en)

RAISING MACHINE

Title (de)

RAUHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

LAINEUSE

Publication

EP 0839223 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97924864 A

Priority

  • DE 9700810 W
  • DE 19619894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19619894C1] A raising machine for raising a fabric web is described. The machine has a driven cylinder (1) mounted in the machine frame (13), with planetary raising rollers. In order to keep one end (15) of the basically cylindrically-shaped cylinder (1) open, while still ensuring smooth running in the bearings with long service life, the peripheries (9) of the ends of the cylinder (1) are each mounted in a ring-shaped ball bearing (10). The ball bearing (10) comprises a ball-bearing shell (11) forming the cylinder (1) and a ball-bearing shell fastened to the machine frame (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19619894 C1 19970605; AU 3023297 A 19971209; DE 19780463 D2 19981029; EP 0839223 A1 19980506; EP 0839223 B1 20010404; ES 2157578 T3 20010816; JP 3133076 B2 20010205; JP H11509898 A 19990831; US 5903960 A 19990518; WO 9744517 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070422

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070423

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070423

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070422

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070422

2006-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157578 T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2001-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703282 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000523

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971205

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT