Global Patent Index - EP 0839246 B1

EP 0839246 B1 2000-05-17 - A SAFE-KEEPING DEVICE FOR A KEY

Title (en)

A SAFE-KEEPING DEVICE FOR A KEY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE SICHERE AUFBEWAHRUNG EINES SCHLÜSSELS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE GARDE POUR UNE CLEF

Publication

EP 0839246 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96923179 A

Priority

  • SE 9600944 W
  • SE 9502609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9704200A1] A key safe-keeping device for installation, for example, in a hole in a door (2), a wall or the like, comprises a tubular unit (3) having an open or closed inner end, which is openably closed at its outer end by a cylinder lock (4). An apartment key (8), for example, can be kept in the unit, which key is removed through the tubular unit (3) after opening the cylinder lock (4) with a pass key or a master key (7). The tubular unit is concentric and is combined with an anchoring element in the form of a nut (11) having a thread (11b) for engagement with a thread (3b) on the tubular unit. The barrel (6) of the cylindrical lock (4) has a latching member (6a) which, when the cylinder lock is locked, engages in at least partially similarly located apertures (14; 15) in the unit (3) and the anchoring element (11). At least the inner of these apertures consists of a through penetrating hole. The arrangement prevents the release of the unit (3) from the anchoring element (11) through engagement with and rotation against the unit by means of a tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/00; E05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/0005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9704200 A1 19970206; DE 69608443 D1 20000621; DE 69608443 T2 20010125; DK 0839246 T3 20000925; EP 0839246 A1 19980506; EP 0839246 B1 20000517; NO 316460 B1 20040126; NO 980132 A 19980313; NO 980132 D0 19980112; SE 506752 C2 19980209; SE 9502609 D0 19950714; SE 9502609 L 19970115

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-05-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608443

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110711

2012-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608443 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990726

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980105

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB