Global Patent Index - EP 0839301 B1

EP 0839301 B1 2000-04-05 - METHOD OF INCINERATING MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD OF INCINERATING MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBRENNUNG VON THERMISCH ZU BEHANDELNDEN STOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INCINERATION DE MATERIAUX A TRAITER THERMIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 0839301 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96926373 A

Priority

  • DE 19526457 A
  • EP 9603198 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9704274A1] Described is a method of incinerating material using a co-current flow technique in which the hot exhaust gases are forced to flow, by fittings mounted above the furnace grate in the primary-combustion zone, along part of the length of the grate above the grate in the same direction as the material on the grate. In a first zone (zone A), the drying zone, a temperature of less than 900 DEG C is maintained, in a second zone (zone B), the destructive-distillation and gasification zone, a temperature of about 1000 DEG C, in a third zone (zone C), the final-combustion zone, a lower temperature again of about 900 DEG C and in a fourth zone (zone D), the sintering zone, a temperature of less than 900 DEG C. The primary-combustion air is fed from the undergrate region through the grate in each zone, additional air at a temperature equal to or lower than the combustion-chamber temperature being supplied to the combsution chamber through the side walls of the combustion chamber as a covering layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/14; F23L 1/02; F23M 3/20; F23M 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/06 (2006.01); F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/14 (2006.01); F23G 5/44 (2006.01); F23L 1/02 (2006.01); F23M 3/20 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 1/02 (2013.01); F23G 5/002 (2013.01); F23G 5/14 (2013.01); F23M 3/20 (2013.01); F23M 5/085 (2013.01); F23G 2201/10 (2013.01); F23G 2202/101 (2013.01); F23G 2203/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9704274 A1 19970206; AT 191552 T 20000415; DE 19629216 A1 19970227; DE 19629216 C2 20000120; DE 59604896 D1 20000511; DK 0839301 T3 20000724; EP 0839301 A1 19980506; EP 0839301 B1 20000405; JP 3121840 B2 20010109; JP H10508371 A 19980818; US 6038988 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110720

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110719

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191552 T

- Effective date: 20110719

2012-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-02-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM *KARLSRUHE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH

- Free text: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH#WEBERSTRASSE 5#76133 KARLSRUHE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH#WEBERSTRASSE 5#76133 KARLSRUHE (DE)

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604896

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604896 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191552 T 20000415

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH

1998-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH

1998-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS GMBH

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980505

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971120

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI LI NL SE