Global Patent Index - EP 0839460 B8

EP 0839460 B8 2002-11-06 - Roasted soybean hypocotyls and beverage material containing the same

Title (en)

Roasted soybean hypocotyls and beverage material containing the same

Title (de)

Röstsojakeime und deren Verwendung für Getränke

Title (fr)

Hypocotyledon de grain de soja et matériel pour boisson le contenant

Publication

EP 0839460 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97308451 A

Priority

  • JP 29249296 A
  • JP 34988696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5972410A] The invention provides a beverage material having roasted soybean hypocotyls which are substantially free of soybean testae and at least one other member from the group of roasted soybean testae, roasted barley, roasted naked barley, roasted Job's-tears and green tea. The beverage material can be prepared using soybean hypocotyls substantially free of soybean testae with the material retaining active ingredients such as isoflavone and having a good flavor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 2/02; A23F 3/14; A23F 3/34; A23L 1/20; A23L 1/202; A23L 2/38; A23L 2/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A21D 2/36 (2006.01); A23F 3/14 (2006.01); A23F 3/34 (2006.01); A23L 2/38 (2006.01); A23L 2/52 (2006.01); A23L 11/00 (2016.01); A23L 11/20 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23F 3/14 (2013.01); A21D 2/362 (2013.01); A23F 3/34 (2013.01); A23L 2/38 (2013.01); A23L 2/52 (2013.01); A23L 11/07 (2016.08); A23L 11/20 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DK FI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5972410 A 19991026; DK 0839460 T3 20020916; EP 0839460 A2 19980506; EP 0839460 A3 19990324; EP 0839460 B1 20020522; EP 0839460 B8 20021106; JP 3424476 B2 20030707; JP H10179100 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FUJI OIL CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-10-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061023

2005-11-08 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-10-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJI OIL CO., LTD

2002-09-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2000-01-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DK FI SE

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TSUZAKI, SHINICHI

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EZAKI, MITSUO

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TAKAMATSU, KIYOHARU

1998-06-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUO, TAKAHARU

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DK FI SE