Global Patent Index - EP 0839492 A3

EP 0839492 A3 2000-03-15 - Floor cleaning device, in particular vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Floor cleaning device, in particular vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bodenreinigung, insbesondere Staubsauger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer des sols, en particulier apsirateur

Publication

EP 0839492 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97115302 A

Priority

  • DE 29618923 U
  • DE 19651026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839492A2] A vacuum cleaner has a fan housing within the main housing (1) with an outlet cross-section and an exhaust air-deflection element. The latter has an inlet cross-section corresponding to the outlet cross-section and a second outlet cross-section that is smaller than its inlet cross-section by at least 30%. The deflecting element is pivoted to the fan housing and has a catch engagement with this or the main housing. The element has a box with grid-like air-deflecting side walls and bases. On the side of the box with the second outlet cross-section, a transverse wall is provided which closes off sections of the inlet cross-section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/10; A47L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/36 (2006.01); A47L 9/00 (2006.01); A47L 9/12 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01); A47L 9/22 (2006.01); A47L 9/26 (2006.01); A47L 9/32 (2006.01); B65D 5/46 (2006.01); B65D 5/468 (2006.01); B65D 85/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/122 (2013.01); A47L 5/36 (2013.01); A47L 9/22 (2013.01); B65D 2585/6847 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839492 A2 19980506; EP 0839492 A3 20000315; DE 19651026 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010401

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI