Global Patent Index - EP 0839608 B1

EP 0839608 B1 2001-05-23 - A polishing and smoothing machine for slabs, tiles and the like.

Title (en)

A polishing and smoothing machine for slabs, tiles and the like.

Title (de)

Polier- und Glättmaschine für Platten, Kacheln und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine pour aplanir et polir des dalles, du carrelage ou similaire

Publication

EP 0839608 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830510 A

Priority

IT MO960144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839608A1] The invention relates to a polishing-smoothing machine for slabs, tiles and the like, comprising: a mobile rest plane (1) for the slabs or tiles (2) on which same are conveyed in a predetermined direction and a rotating platform (3), commanded to rotate about an axis which is incident on the mobile rest plane (1) and provided with frontal rotating brushes (4) each of which is freely rotatingly mobile about an axis not coinciding with the rotation axis of the platform (3) which operates contactingly on at least one slab or tile (2) situated on the plane (1). The rotation axis of each frontal rotating brush (4) is inclined at a predetermined angle with respect to a perpendicular of the mobile rest plane (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 41/047; B24B 7/06; B24B 7/22; B24B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/06 (2006.01); B24B 7/22 (2006.01); B24B 29/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/047 (2013.01); B24B 7/06 (2013.01); B24B 7/22 (2013.01); B24B 29/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839608 A1 19980506; EP 0839608 B1 20010523; DE 69704918 D1 20010628; DE 69704918 T2 20011115; ES 2157057 T3 20010801; IT 1287499 B1 19980806; IT MO960144 A1 19980504; IT MO960144 D0 19961104; PT 839608 E 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041011

2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041010

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-04-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2004-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041010

2003-11-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157057 T3

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704918 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001016

1999-02-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES LI

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES LI

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980930

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI