Global patent index - EP 0839650 B1

EP 0839650 B1 2000-03-29 - Powdering device

Title (en)

Powdering device

Title (de)

Bestäubungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de poudrage

Publication

EP 0839650 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117529 A

Priority

DE 19643987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19643987C1] A suction device has suction components arranged close to the outlet apertures of the nozzles. The extending row of nozzles (11) of the spraying device (10), in relation to a conveyor plane (9), are arranged inclined at an angle (alpha) in the conveyor direction (3) of the printed material (4). Components of the suction device (13) are provided for the outlet apertures of the nozzles. The spraying device or the suction components are movable in at least one relative movement. The suction components can be activated dependent upon the printed material format or the print picture. The suction components are driven by an operating unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19643987 C1 19980219; AT 191180 T 20000415; EP 0839650 A1 19980506; EP 0839650 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031010

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191180

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990208

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980306

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI