Global patent index - EP 0839651 B1

EP 0839651 B1 2000-07-12 - Powdering method, specially for printed sheet materials in a printing machine

Title (en)

Powdering method, specially for printed sheet materials in a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bestäuben, vorzugsweise eines bogenförmigen Druckstoffes in einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour saupoudrer, spécialement un matériau en feuille imprimé dans une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0839651 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117530 A

Priority

DE 19643986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839651A1] The method uses a dust-applicator which comprises at least one row of nozzles extending over the maximum format width of the printing material. The current consisting of compressed air and dusting material emerging from the nozzles through the dust-applicator is constantly produced. The flow volume is entirely or partially sucked up directly by the nozzles and returned into the dust-applicator circuit. The flow volume not sucked up is conveyed to the plane of motion and the direction of the motion of the printed material on a slope towards the printed material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839651 A1 19980506; EP 0839651 B1 20000712; AT 194549 T 20000715; DE 19643986 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194549

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981207

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980306

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI