Global Patent Index - EP 0839652 B1

EP 0839652 B1 2001-04-04 - Method for cleaning cylinders and rollers in a printing machine

Title (en)

Method for cleaning cylinders and rollers in a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung von Zylindern und Walzen in einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de nettoyage des cylindres et des rouleaux dans une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0839652 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117937 A

Priority

DE 19645169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839652A2] The method uses a train of inker rollers (4) which has a spray and doctor arrangement. At least one train of damping rollers (3) possesses a humidity-application roller (6) and a humidity-ductor (7). The train of damping rollers is integrated in the train of inking rollers by a bridge roller (5). A rider roller (12) frictionally connected to the humidity-applicator roller is in frictional contact with a dispenser roller belonging to the humidity-ductor. The humidity-applicator roller is driven at a peripheral speed synchronous with that of the humidity-ductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 23/08; B41F 35/02; B41F 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839652 A2 19980506; EP 0839652 A3 19981202; EP 0839652 B1 20010404; DE 19645169 A1 19980514; DE 19645169 C2 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703283

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051016

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031016

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-10-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031016

2002-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703283 20010510

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990727

1999-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES LI

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981105

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI