Global Patent Index - EP 0839735 B1

EP 0839735 B1 2000-04-05 - Articulated closure cap with improved connecting element

Title (en)

Articulated closure cap with improved connecting element

Title (de)

Angelenkte Kapsel mit verbessertem Verbindungselement

Title (fr)

Capsule articulée à élément de liaison amélioré

Publication

EP 0839735 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401540 A

Priority

FR 9610575 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2752818A1] A dispensing cap, e.g. for a viscous liquid cosmetic, pharmaceutical or household product, consists of the cap itself, made from a rigid or semi-rigid material and equipped with a dispensing aperture (4) and a hinged lid (5) of a rigid or semi-rigid material, made with a stopper (6) to fit in the dispensing aperture and seal it when the lid is closed. The lid is attached to the cap by a connector of an elastomer material which is able to stretch as the lid passes between its open and closed positions. The material used for the connector is one which is physically and chemically compatible with the polypropylene or polyethylene used for the cap and lid. It is selected from propylene/ethylene copolymers; polyether block amides, polyvinyls, ethylene terpolymers; EPDM; styrene-butadiene sequenced polymers (SBS), styrene-ethylene-butadiene sequenced polymers (SEBS-SIS), polyurethanes, or mixtures of propylene with SEBS-SIS, EPDM or SBS.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0814 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2752818 A1 19980306; FR 2752818 B1 19981016; AT 191419 T 20000415; DE 69701610 D1 20000511; DE 69701610 T2 20000720; EP 0839735 A1 19980506; EP 0839735 B1 20000405; ES 2145562 T3 20000701; US 5950848 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170630

2017-07-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69701610

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L' OREAL

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145562 T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701610 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191419 T 20000415

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971222

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI