Global Patent Index - EP 0839745 B1

EP 0839745 B1 2000-04-05 - Device for guiding a paper web on a band

Title (en)

Device for guiding a paper web on a band

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Führung einer Papierbahn auf einem Band

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour guider une bande de papier sur un ruban

Publication

EP 0839745 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115572 A

Priority

DE 19643814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839745A2] The guide comprises foils with air flow diverting surfaces (16,18) positioned on to the side of the web (14) being transported by the felt (12). The boundary layer of air entrained by the web on the opposite side to the felt is forced through the gap between the foils and the web, creating a build-up of pressure at the entrance to the gap that urges the web downwards onto the felt. Preferably the foils are positioned on both sides of the web at an angle pointing towards the centre of the web in the machine direction (24). Foils on the opposite side of the felt strip entrain air away from the felt, creating a vacuum that sucks the web against the felt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/10; B65H 20/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839745 A2 19980506; EP 0839745 A3 19981209; EP 0839745 B1 20000405; AT 191427 T 20000415; DE 19643814 A1 19980507; US 6010128 A 20000104

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-06 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-09-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020909

2001-10-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010909

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000919

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191427

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE