Global Patent Index - EP 0839952 B1

EP 0839952 B1 2002-12-04 - Shoe press

Title (en)

Shoe press

Title (de)

Schuhpresse

Title (fr)

Patin de pressage

Publication

EP 0839952 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97116138 A

Priority

DE 19644108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839952A1] In the shoe press assembly, of a papermaking machine, the support surface (4) of the shoe (6) is generally flat, so that the shoe (6) works with a facing shoe (8) also with a generally flat support surface (7) with a support carrier (9), to form the press gap (20) between them. The two support surfaces (4,7) are parallel, while the second surface (7) supports a continuous rotating belt (10). At least one shoe (6,8) can be pressed against the other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0245 (2013.01); D21F 3/0218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839952 A1 19980506; EP 0839952 B1 20021204; CA 2219688 A1 19980430; DE 19644108 A1 19980507; JP H10131075 A 19980519

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708880 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE