Global Patent Index - EP 0839964 A3

EP 0839964 A3 2000-11-02 - Well cover

Title (en)

Well cover

Title (de)

Deckel für Bohrlöcher

Title (fr)

Couvercle pour puits

Publication

EP 0839964 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97203383 A

Priority

NL 1004421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839964A2] A cover (1) for holes (4) in concrete, asphalt or similar floors consists of a flat lid (9), a sealing clamp on the underside (10) and a system (12,23) to compress the seal against the cover and increase its diameter to seal the hole. The cover extends (16-18) beyond the clamping area and is provided with a further seal (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/14; E21B 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01); E21B 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/02 (2013.01); E02D 29/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

NL 1004421 C1 19970403; EP 0839964 A2 19980506; EP 0839964 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02D 29/14 A, 7E 21B 33/02 B

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI