Global Patent Index - EP 0839977 B1

EP 0839977 B1 2002-09-04 - Handle with simplified safety actuation for doors of trucks, trailers or the like

Title (en)

Handle with simplified safety actuation for doors of trucks, trailers or the like

Title (de)

Handhabe mit vereinfachter Sicherheitsbetätigung für Lastwagentüre, Anhängertüre oder ähnliches

Title (fr)

Poignée à commande de sécurité simplifiée pour une porte de camion, de remorque ou similaire

Publication

EP 0839977 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97118915 A

Priority

IT BO960150 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0839977A2] A handle with simplified safety actuation for doors of trucks, trailers or the like, comprising: a first box-like element (2), which is provided with means for fixing to the door and is provided with an engagement tooth (5) rigidly coupled to the bottom (3); a second box-like element (6), which is articulated along one side of the first element (2) and has means for the articulation of two secondary arms (14a;14b) of a U-shaped handle (14) about an axis which is parallel to the rod; a case (16) which is rigidly coupled to the second box-like element (6) and in which a spring latch (18) is fitted so that it can slide in contrast with elastic means (17a,17b), the spring latch being suitable to engage the tooth (5); at least one inclined lug (19a,19b), which is rigidly coupled to a secondary arm (14a;14b) of the handle and is suitable to actuate the spring latch (18) for release; the bottom (3) of the first box-like element (2) has a through hole (24), through which it is possible to insert a pin for the release of the spring latch (18) regardless of the position of the handle (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/16; E05C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/16 (2006.01); E05C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/10 (2013.01); E05B 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0839977 A2 19980506; EP 0839977 A3 19990512; EP 0839977 B1 20020904; AT 223549 T 20020915; DE 69715129 D1 20021010; DE 69715129 T2 20030109; DK 0839977 T3 20021202; ES 2183067 T3 20030316; IT 242438 Y1 20010614; IT BO960150 U1 19980504; PT 839977 E 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171108

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171029

2018-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171030

2017-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 223549 T

- Effective date: 20171030

2017-11-29 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-11-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171029

2017-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-11-06 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20171030

2017-11-01 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20171029

2017-10-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715129

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PASTORE & LOMBARDI S.R.L.

- Free text: PASTORE & LOMBARDI S.R.L.#VIA DON MINZONI, 3#40057 CADRIANO DI GRANAROLO EMILIA (BOLOGNA) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- PASTORE & LOMBARDI S.R.L.#VIA DON MINZONI, 3#40057 CADRIANO DI GRANAROLO EMILIA (BOLOGNA) (IT)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183067 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404059

2002-12-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715129 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223549 T 20020915

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991027

1999-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI