Global Patent Index - EP 0840071 B1

EP 0840071 B1 2002-12-11 - Air conditioner and method of controlling the air conditioner

Title (en)

Air conditioner and method of controlling the air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimagerät und Steuerverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air et méthode pour sa commande

Publication

EP 0840071 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97308769 A

Priority

JP 29088396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0840071A2] In an air conditioner (1), a refrigerant circulation cycle is constituted by sequentially connecting a compressor (2), an indoor heat exchanger (4) having an indoor fan (4a), a PMV and an outdoor heat exchanger (6) having an outdoor fan (6a). An alternative refrigerant having a saturated pressure higher than that of HCFC22(R22) at the same temperature is used as a refrigerant. The blowout angle of air blown out from the indoor fan (4a) is vertically regulated by lateral louvers. An indoor controller, a louver motor (LM) and a louver drive circuit are adapted to control, at the start of heating operation, the lateral louvers (27a,27b) so as to direct the air flow upward toward a ceiling side in the room and, when the indoor heat exchanger (4) reaches a state capable of executing heat exchange operation, adapted to control the lateral louvers (27a,27b) so as to direct the air flow downward toward a floor side in the room.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25B 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 11/79 (2018.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01); F25B 2400/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0840071 A2 19980506; EP 0840071 A3 19980916; EP 0840071 B1 20021211; CN 1108491 C 20030514; CN 1181484 A 19980513; JP 3495858 B2 20040209; JP H10132358 A 19980522; KR 100263664 B1 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

1999-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971124

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI