Global Patent Index - EP 0840097 B1

EP 0840097 B1 2002-09-11 - Movable support member for an examining or controlling device, method for its manufacture and use thereof

Title (en)

Movable support member for an examining or controlling device, method for its manufacture and use thereof

Title (de)

Bewegliche Trägervorrichtung für eine Untersuchungs- oder Kontrollvorrichtung, sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Lame de support et de déplacement d'un dispositif d'examen ou de contrôle, procédé de fabrication de la lame et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0840097 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402462 A

Priority

FR 9613273 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0840097A1] A blade (24) for supporting and moving an examining or controlling device (26) for an industrial installation element accessible only through a tight not straight passage is made in a single piece of moulded plastic having good tensile strength, low coefficient of resistance and high wear resistance against metal abrasion. Conductors (29) connected to the device (26) are totally embedded in the plastic throughout the length of the blade. Also claimed is the production of a core or insert containing the conductors laid parallel and over-moulding the core with the plastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 5/39; G01D 5/26; G02B 6/04; G02B 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/26 (2006.01); G01D 5/39 (2006.01); G02B 6/04 (2006.01); G02B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/268 (2013.01); G01D 5/39 (2013.01); G02B 6/04 (2013.01); G02B 23/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH ES LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0840097 A1 19980506; EP 0840097 B1 20020911; ES 2183104 T3 20030316; FR 2755229 A1 19980430; FR 2755229 B1 19990115

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041018

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-10-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2003-11-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183104 T3

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES LI SE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

1999-03-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH ES LI SE

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES LI SE

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980404

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES LI SE

1998-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI