Global Patent Index - EP 0840280 A3

EP 0840280 A3 2000-03-22 - String instrument

Title (en)

String instrument

Title (de)

Saiteninstrument

Title (fr)

Instrument à corde

Publication

EP 0840280 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97810768 A

Priority

DE 19645533 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0840280A2] Within the resonance body (3) are provided at least one lever (6) running crossways to the direction of the strings and a support component (8). The lever and support component transmit common vibration movements of the cover phase displaced to the base (11). The lever in the area of the bridge locates at two points on the cover (2) or is fixed to it. One of these positions is located in the area beneath the high tone string (4) and the other in the area beneath the deep tone string (5). A part of the lever extends on the side of the high tone string over the area of the bridge (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10D 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0840280 A2 19980506; EP 0840280 A3 20000322; CN 1182257 A 19980520; DE 19645533 A1 19980507; JP H10143144 A 19980529; US 5998712 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021001

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT