Global Patent Index - EP 0840393 A3

EP 0840393 A3 2000-08-16 - Antenna system for a satellite supported navigating missile

Title (en)

Antenna system for a satellite supported navigating missile

Title (de)

Antennensystem für eine satellitengestützt navigierende Rakete

Title (fr)

Système d'antenne pour la navigation d'un missile supporté par satellite

Publication

EP 0840393 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119021 A

Priority

DE 19645496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0840393A2] The antenna system has several antennas (18) arranged adjacent to each other along the body (17) of the rocket (11) and connected to a navigation receiver (13) via a multiplexer (25) which passes signals depending on the roll position. The multiplexer switches several peripheral adjacent antennas to the navigation receiver via a summing amplifier (26). A position sensor (27) is used to switch the multiplexer, e.g. a centre of gravity position sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/24; H01Q 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/28 (2006.01); H01Q 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2013.01); H01Q 1/28 (2013.01); H01Q 3/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3627597 A1 19880218 - LICENTIA GMBH [DE]
  • [A] US 5467940 A 19951121 - STEUER RAIMAR [DE]
  • [A] GREGORWICH W S: "An electronically despun array flush-mounted on a cylindrical spacecraft", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, JAN. 1974, USA, vol. AP-22, no. 1, pages 71 - 74, XP002139988, ISSN: 0018-926X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0840393 A2 19980506; EP 0840393 A3 20000816; EP 0840393 B1 20060301; DE 19645496 A1 19980514; DE 19645496 C2 20010517; DE 59712582 D1 20060427

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712582 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT