Global Patent Index - EP 0840560 B1

EP 0840560 B1 2000-12-20 - ILLUMINATED PURSE

Title (en)

ILLUMINATED PURSE

Title (de)

GELDTASCHE MIT EINER BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PORTE-MONNAIE POURVU D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE

Publication

EP 0840560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95925678 A

Priority

DE 9500867 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9702768A1] The purse has a banknote compartment (13) and a coin compartment (8) and a UV lighting unit (4) activatable when the purse is opened to generate UV radiation making fluorescent and/or phosphorescent pigments in banknotes visible. This makes it easy to detect forged banknotes. The UV lighting unit is preferably a lamp with a flat housing (30) containing a rare gas, especially mercury vapour. The gas is ignited via spiral-wound filaments (50) in two housing plugs (31, 32) arranged on opposite edges of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 1/00; G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/128 (2013.01); A45C 1/00 (2013.01); G07D 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9702768 A1 19970130; AT 198130 T 20010115; AU 2974095 A 19970210; DE 59508917 D1 20010125; EP 0840560 A1 19980513; EP 0840560 B1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010707

2001-06-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-05-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508917 20010125

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198130 T 20010115

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE