Global Patent Index - EP 0840591 B1

EP 0840591 B1 2001-03-14 - ORAL DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF DISCRETE UNITS

Title (en)

ORAL DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF DISCRETE UNITS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG VON DISKRETEN EINHEITEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR ADMINISTRATION D'UNITES DISCRETES PAR VOIE ORALE

Publication

EP 0840591 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96924555 A

Priority

  • US 9611812 W
  • US 131995 P
  • US 58254496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703634A1] The present invention is directed to an oral active agent delivery system and method for delivering discrete units of an active agent formulation to a patient. An active agent formulation chamber (10) containing the active agent formulation and having a fluid passing active agent formulation retainer (14) is placed at one end (16) into a fluid and at a second end (18) into a patient's mouth. The active agent is delivered when the patient sips on the end of the chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 7/00; A47G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/18 (2006.01); A61J 7/00 (2006.01); A61J 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/183 (2013.01); A61J 7/0038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703634 A1 19970206; AT 199638 T 20010315; AU 6498096 A 19970218; AU 713120 B2 19991125; BR 9609696 A 19990323; CA 2226267 A1 19970206; CA 2226267 C 20080122; CN 1113640 C 20030709; CN 1191476 A 19980826; DE 69612098 D1 20010419; DE 69612098 T2 20010621; DK 0840591 T3 20010417; DK 0988850 T3 20050124; EP 0840591 A1 19980513; EP 0840591 B1 20010314; EP 0988850 A2 20000329; EP 0988850 A3 20000517; EP 0988850 B1 20040922; ES 2154829 T3 20010416; ES 2228398 T3 20050416; GR 3035850 T3 20010831; HK 1015671 A1 20031212; JP 3818664 B2 20060906; JP H11510066 A 19990907; KR 100449538 B1 20041217; NZ 313010 A 19990329; NZ 333997 A 19990329; PT 840591 E 20010629; TW 347339 B 19981211

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160718

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160726

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160716

2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160717

2016-10-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161026

2016-10-03 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20010400700

- Effective date: 20160718

2016-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199638 T

- Effective date: 20160717

2016-08-24 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-08-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160716

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-25 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160717

2016-07-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160716

2016-07-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612098

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150714

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150716

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150615

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612098

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612098

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALZA CORPORATION

- Free text: ALZA CORPORATION#950 PAGE MILL ROAD P.O. BOX 10950#PALO ALTO CALIFORNIA 94303-0802 (US) -TRANSFER TO- ALZA CORPORATION#950 PAGE MILL ROAD P.O. BOX 10950#PALO ALTO CALIFORNIA 94303-0802 (US)

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612098 20010419

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-04-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154829 T3

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199638 T 20010315

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ORAL DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF DISCRETE UNITS

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ORAL DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF DISCRETE UNITS

2000-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ORAL DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF DISCRETE UNITS

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980126

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE