Global patent index - EP 0840672 B1

EP 0840672 B1 2000-03-08 - CROSS-CUTTER FOR A WEB OF MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR OF CORRUGATED CARDBOARD

Title (en)

CROSS-CUTTER FOR A WEB OF MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR OF CORRUGATED CARDBOARD

Title (de)

QUERSCHNEIDER FÜR EINE WARENBAHN, INSBESONDERE WELLPAPPENBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE TRANSVERSALE POUR FEUILLE CONTINUE, EN PARTICULIER POUR FEUILLE CONTINUE DE CARTON ONDULE

Publication

EP 0840672 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97922866 A

Priority

  • DE 9700841 W
  • DE 19620663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19620663A1] The cross-cutter (1) for a web of material, in particular of corrugated cardboard, has pairs of driven rotating cutter bars (5, 6) arranged one above the other in a frame, and having knives running lengthwise along the bar (8). Each cutter bar (5, 6) is connected directly to a drive motor (10) at each end (9). There is a synchronizing device (11, 12, 13) for the cutter bars (5, 6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/62; F16H 55/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26D 1/62 (2006.01); B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 5/08 (2006.01); F16H 55/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/086 (2013.01); B26D 1/626 (2013.01); B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 5/08 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4824 (2015.04); Y10T 83/483 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8796 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19620663 A1 19971127; EP 0840672 A1 19980513; EP 0840672 B1 20000308; ES 2146095 T3 20000716; JP 4041540 B2 20080130; JP H11509786 A 19990831; US 6142048 A 20001107; WO 9744167 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050426

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-04-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050425

2004-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040413

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146095

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701212

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990225

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971222

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT