Global Patent Index - EP 0840703 A4

EP 0840703 A4 2000-05-10 - HANDLING DEVICE FOR LAYERED CELLULOSE PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR COTTON WOOL PADS

Title (en)

HANDLING DEVICE FOR LAYERED CELLULOSE PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR COTTON WOOL PADS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM MANIPULIEREN VON PRODUKTEN AUS ZELLULOSE, INSBESONDERE VON WATTETAMPONS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MANIPULER DES PRODUITS CELLULOSIQUES SUPERPOSES, EN PARTICULIER DES TAMPONS D'OUATE

Publication

EP 0840703 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96906669 A

Priority

  • DE 19508248 A
  • US 9602964 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19508248A1] A handling device for conveying layered cellulose products (cotton wool pads 1) formed successively during production between a production station (stamping machine 2) and a packaging station is provided with an intermediate storage system (4) with at least one pair of separate holding chambers (5, 6) for the serial holding of the cellulose products (cotton wool pads 1) delivered successively from the production station (stamping machine 2) in a number corresponding to the packaging unit and for the transfer of the cellulose products (cotton wool pads 1) held in this way as a package (67) into a respective conveying cartridge (10). One holding chamber (5) of the pair, of which there is at least one, can be coupled to the outlet of the production station (stamping machine 2) and at the same time the other holding chamber (6) in a transfer station (11) to the respective conveying cartridge (10) alternately.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/30; B26D 7/18; B26D 7/32; B65B 35/04; B65B 35/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 63/02 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01); B65B 35/04 (2006.01); B65B 35/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/30 (2013.01); B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 7/32 (2013.01); B65B 35/04 (2013.01); B26D 2007/1881 (2013.01); B26D 2007/322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19508248 A1 19960912; AT 218485 T 20020615; AU 4999196 A 19961002; CA 2213425 A1 19960919; CA 2213425 C 20000801; EP 0840703 A2 19980513; EP 0840703 A4 20000510; EP 0840703 B1 20020605; ES 2175078 T3 20021116; JP H11501891 A 19990216; KR 100231621 B1 19991115; MX 9706789 A 19971129; WO 9628347 A2 19960919; WO 9628347 A3 19961114

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160306

2016-06-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160624

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-03-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160304

2016-03-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69621618

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175078 T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-09-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69621618 20020711

2002-07-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218485 T 20020615

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-05-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65G 47/30 A, 7B 65B 35/04 B, 7B 65B 35/30 B, 7B 26D 7/18 B, 7B 26D 7/32 B

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE