Global Patent Index - EP 0840786 A4

EP 0840786 A4 2000-05-10 - GDU, A NOVEL SIGNALLING PROTEIN

Title (en)

GDU, A NOVEL SIGNALLING PROTEIN

Title (de)

NEUARTIGES SIGNALPROTEIN GDU

Title (fr)

UNE NOUVELLE PROTEINE SIGNAL, LA GDU

Publication

EP 0840786 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96911844 A

Priority

  • AU 9600258 W
  • AU PN274295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9634951A1] The present invention provides the nucleotide and amino acid sequence of a previously unidentified erbB receptor target. The nucleotide and amino acid sequence is set out in the figure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 0753010 A1 19970115 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
  • [X] DATABASE GENBANK 20 April 1995 (1995-04-20), HILLIER ET AL.: "Human EST from placenta tissue", XP002132371
  • [T] DALY R J ET AL: "Cloning and characterization of GRB14, a novel member of the GRB7 gene family.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996 MAY 24) 271 (21) 12502-10., XP002131809
  • See also references of WO 9634951A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9634951 A1 19961107; AU PN274295 D0 19950525; CA 2220016 A1 19961107; EP 0840786 A1 19980513; EP 0840786 A4 20000510; JP H11505415 A 19990521

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050725

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2000-05-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971119

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE