Global patent index - EP 0840828 B1

EP 0840828 B1 2000-12-06 - WASTE WATER DISPOSAL PROCESS

Title (en)

WASTE WATER DISPOSAL PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ABLEITUNG VON ABWÄSSERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EVACUATION DES EAUX USEES

Publication

EP 0840828 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96918630 A

Priority

  • DE 19514359 A
  • EP 9601626 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19514359A1] A process is disclosed for disposing of waste water from settlement and industrial areas. Waste water flow through the drains is intermittently controlled by a flow controller. Waste water is temporarily damned upstream of the controller, so that waste water flow is interrupted in the downstream drains, then the damned waste water is released by switching the controller and flows through the downstream drains in a turbulent flow that uniformly distributes solid substances in the waste water and generates high entraining forces for removing even solid and scaly deposits. This process can be applied for partially of fully filled sewers while the energy of the accumulated waste water is converted during the intermittent flow operation. A rotary, curved channel section disclosed in German patent 39 22 481 and/or a liftable hose piece disclosed in German patent 39 43 607 are used as flow controllers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/00 (2006.01); E03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 9/007 (2013.01); E03F 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19514359 A1 19961024; AU 6122896 A 19961107; DE 59606191 D1 20010111; EP 0840828 A1 19980513; EP 0840828 B1 20001206; WO 9633319 A1 19961024

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030607

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE BANK A.G. IN HAMBURG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-06-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-03-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-03-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606191

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

2000-12-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000321

1999-10-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE BANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT IN HAMBURG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUPCZIK, GUENTER, DIPL.-ING.

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUPCZIK, GUENTER, DIPL.-ING.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUPCZIK, GUENTER, DIPL.-ING.

1998-09-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

1998-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUPCZIK, BORIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUPCZIK, KORNELIUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KUPCZIK, GUENTER

1998-05-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT