Global Patent Index - EP 0840927 B1

EP 0840927 B1 2000-05-10 - COMPACT DISC CHANGER UTILIZING DISC DATABASE

Title (en)

COMPACT DISC CHANGER UTILIZING DISC DATABASE

Title (de)

COMPACT DISK PLATTENWECHSLER MIT VERWENDUNG VON DISKDATABASIS

Title (fr)

CHANGEUR DE DISQUES COMPACTS UTILISANT UNE BASE DE DONNEES SUR DISQUES

Publication

EP 0840927 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96922640 A

Priority

  • US 9611205 W
  • US 50754495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6128625A] A method and apparatus for updating a memory in a Compact Disc changer. Information identifying discs stored in a CD changer is stored in a memory. The memory is updated when a CD is loaded which does not have identifying features which are recognized by the CD changer. Updating is carried out via a modem connection to a remote database. The database can be stored locally in a local database residing in a personal computer where the database can be queried to locate desired tracks and can be used to facilitate control of the compact disc changer by providing a simplified interface for building a play list and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 27/00; G11B 27/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/10 (2006.01); G06F 3/06 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); G11B 27/00 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/11 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); G11B 27/28 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 27/002 (2013.01); G11B 27/11 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); G11B 27/007 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 27/28 (2013.01); G11B 27/329 (2013.01); G11B 2220/213 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2529 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2545 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01); G11B 2220/65 (2013.01); Y10S 707/916 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99945 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99948 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6128625 A 20001003; AT 192879 T 20000515; AU 6344896 A 19970226; AU 700004 B2 19981217; CA 2227519 A1 19970213; CA 2227519 C 20061212; CN 100385562 C 20080430; CN 100414639 C 20080827; CN 100437811 C 20081126; CN 1160728 C 20040804; CN 1192285 A 19980902; CN 1495787 A 20040512; CN 1501395 A 20040602; CN 1501396 A 20040602; CN 1917076 A 20070221; CN 1917076 B 20100512; DE 69608281 D1 20000615; DE 69608281 T2 20001130; EP 0840927 A1 19980513; EP 0840927 B1 20000510; HK 1007910 A1 20000728; HK 1064203 A1 20090522; HK 1064793 A1 20090619; HK 1064794 A1 20080801; JP 2004355627 A 20041216; JP 2005339800 A 20051208; JP 2006019014 A 20060119; JP 2006073183 A 20060316; JP 2006073184 A 20060316; JP 2006073185 A 20060316; JP 2007172825 A 20070705; JP 2008192294 A 20080821; JP 3932050 B2 20070620; JP 3932051 B2 20070620; JP 4195084 B2 20081210; JP 4197330 B2 20081217; JP 4660565 B2 20110330; JP H11514482 A 19991207; MX 9800613 A 19980731; US 2001004338 A1 20010621; US 2001056424 A1 20011227; US 2001056430 A1 20011227; US 5751672 A 19980512; US 6128255 A 20001003; US 6147940 A 20001114; US 6247022 B1 20010612; US 6272078 B2 20010807; US 6388957 B2 20020514; US 6388958 B1 20020514; WO 9705616 A1 19970213

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160702

2016-08-24 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160701

2016-07-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608281

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150717

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000808

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000713

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000621

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000621

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608281 20000615

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192879 T 20000515

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981208

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE