Global Patent Index - EP 0841025 A3

EP 0841025 A3 2000-03-01 - Device for holding a care apparatus

Title (en)

Device for holding a care apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Halten eines Pflegegerätes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien d'un appareil d'entretien

Publication

EP 0841025 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119611 A

Priority

DE 29619569 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841025A2] The toothbrush has a hemispherical holding end (B) with the hemisphere forming a self-supporting stand. A conical portion forms the connection between the hemispherical end and the narrow portion (A) of the handle, carrying the bristles of the toothbrush at its end. The centre of gravity of the complete object is in the lower part of the holder. This ensures that automatic vertical alignment of the handle is ensured from any position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619569 U1 19970327; EP 0841025 A2 19980513; EP 0841025 A3 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI