Global Patent Index - EP 0841105 A3

EP 0841105 A3 2000-01-26 - Method for extruding of a cup-shaped part

Title (en)

Method for extruding of a cup-shaped part

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Fliesspressen eines napfförmigen Teils

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le filage d'une pièce en forme de godet

Publication

EP 0841105 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97119363 A

Priority

DE 19645954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841105A2] The component (10) is extruded from approximately a cylindrical blank (1) using a fluid lubricant. A die is used to form recesses (3) on the inner wall surface of the blank, before the extrusion process takes place, and preferably used to form a recessed centering shoulder (2) and the recesses simultaneously. The recesses extending to the edge of the shoulder are channel-shaped, and positioned at even relative distances. They have mainly semi-circular profile. The blank is preheated, and forming method may be reverse extrusion, forward extrusion, lateral extrusion, or a combination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 23/32; B21C 23/20; B21C 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/18 (2006.01); B21C 23/20 (2006.01); B21C 23/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 23/186 (2013.01); B21C 23/205 (2013.01); B21C 23/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] BE 551053 A
  • [A] US 4129022 A 19781212 - THONNES HORST, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 526 (M - 897) 22 November 1989 (1989-11-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841105 A2 19980513; EP 0841105 A3 20000126; EP 0841105 B1 20030326; DE 19645954 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59709612

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59709612 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI