Global Patent Index - EP 0841154 B1

EP 0841154 B1 2001-12-19 - Machine for reprofiling corrugated products

Title (en)

Machine for reprofiling corrugated products

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum erneuten Profilieren von Wellpappen

Title (fr)

Machine pour reprofiler des matériaux ondulés

Publication

EP 0841154 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97402690 A

Priority

FR 9613763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841154A1] The continuous re-profiling machine consists of supporting bars (7) for the corrugated material, driven in a direction perpendicular to their lengthwise orientation, and re-profiling bars (2) connected to a rotating endless chain (11) and moved relative to it. It also has counter-forming bars (6) connected to a second rotating endless chain (16) and moved relative to it. The cross-sectional shape of the counter-form bars is complementary to that of the re-profiling bars, and the re-profiling and counter-form bars are located on either side of the layer of supporting bars (7) so that they face one another and move perpendicular to the plane of the supporting bars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/07; B31F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 13/06 (2006.01); B31F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841154 A1 19980513; EP 0841154 B1 20011219; AT 211059 T 20020115; BR 9705461 A 20031007; CA 2221224 A1 19980512; CA 2221224 C 20070424; CN 1083766 C 20020501; CN 1190617 A 19980819; DE 69709294 D1 20020131; DE 69709294 T2 20020808; DE 841154 T1 19981022; DK 0841154 T3 20020415; ES 2117619 T1 19980816; ES 2117619 T3 20020501; FR 2755639 A1 19980515; FR 2755639 B1 19990129; HK 1014904 A1 20030117; ID 19102 A 19980611; MX 9708666 A 19980930; MY 118258 A 20040930; PL 183888 B1 20020731; PL 323071 A1 19980525; PT 841154 E 20020531; RU 2199410 C2 20030227; TR 199701349 A2 19980521; US 5858418 A 19990112; ZA 9710161 B 19980528

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171111

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171109

2017-11-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171109

2017-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-11-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69709294

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160905

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160906

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131111

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2014-05-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140512

2014-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-08-30 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020401046

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-08-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-08-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211059 T

- Effective date: 20121110

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121005

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ONDULINE S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ONDULINE S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69709294

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Effective date: 20110420

2011-04-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-09 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110121

2011-02-09 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110121

2011-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ONDULINE38 RUE BAUDIN, F-92300 LEVALLOIS-PERRET

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-01-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Effective date: 20110120

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101108

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ONDULINE

- Free text: ONDULINE S.A.#38, RUE SAINT FERDINAND#75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ONDULINE#35 RUE BAUDIN#92300 LEVALLOIS-PERRET (FR)

2010-12-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101202 AND 20101208

2010-12-23 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OMNIUM FRANCAIS INDUSTRIEL ET COMMERCIAL OFIC, FR

- Effective date: 20101216

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401046

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117619 T3

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709294 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211059 T 20020115

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981113

1998-12-16 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

1998-10-22 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2117619 T1

1998-08-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-08-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1998-07-22 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1998-07-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUCHY, MICHEL

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE