Global patent index - EP 0841157 A3

EP 0841157 A3 2000-05-17 - Flexible laminates bonded with water-based laminating ink vehicles and laminating adhesives

Title (en)

Flexible laminates bonded with water-based laminating ink vehicles and laminating adhesives

Title (de)

Flexible Schichtstoffe verbunden mittels laminierenden Tintenmedien auf Wasserbasis und Klebstoffen

Title (fr)

Stratifiés flexibles liés par des véhicules d'encre à base aqueuse et des adhésifs

Publication

EP 0841157 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97119372 A

Priority

US 74626396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0841157A2] This invention relates to improved flexible laminates formed from at least one corona treated polyolefin or polyester film bonded to another polymeric or cellulosic film via an aqueous based laminating adhesive. The improvement in the flexible laminates resides in the aqueous based laminating adhesive used to bond the respective films. The aqueous based laminating adhesive is comprised of an acrylic interpolymer prepared by emulsion polymerizing alkyl (meth)acrylates, alpha - beta unsaturated olefins, such as styrene and suitably substituted styrenes, and/or alpha - beta unsaturated nitriles, such as acrylonitrile with a glycidyl (meth)acrylate and having the pendent epoxy group converted to the hydroxy amine. The preferred pendant units are hydroxy propylamine groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 7/12; B65D 65/40; C08F 3/32; C09J 133/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/12 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24802 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249994 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249995 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31515 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31692 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31797 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0841157 A2 19980513; EP 0841157 A3 20000517; CA 2219938 A1 19980507; CA 2219938 C 20010206; US 5858524 A 19990112

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 32B 7/12 A, 7B 65D 65/40 B, 7C 09J 133/00 B, 7C 08F 3/32 B

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI